TX HB1857 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an exemption from the plumbing licensing law for plumbing work performed on certain private property.
Title
Relating to an exemption from the plumbing licensing law for plumbing work performed on certain private property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1034 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1857 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01857I.htm |