TX HB1846 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Left pending in subcommittee
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Left pending in subcommittee
Summary
Relating to a person who is entitled to claim a lien on certain assets.
Title
Relating to a person who is entitled to claim a lien on certain assets.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-09 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-03-04 | Read first time | |
2009-02-25 | Filed |
Subjects
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PRIVATE INVESTIGATORS & PRIVATE SECURITY AGENCIES
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PRIVATE INVESTIGATORS & PRIVATE SECURITY AGENCIES
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens