TX HB1842 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to public school accountability, including the intervention in and sanction of a public school that has received an academically unsuccessful performance rating for at least two consecutive school years and the designation of a school district as a district of innovation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public school accountability, including the intervention in and sanction of a public school that has received an academically unsuccessful performance rating for at least two consecutive school years and the designation of a school district as a district of innovation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-31 - House - HB 1842Third Reading House (Y: 125 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - HB 1842Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19 Effective immediately
2015-06-19 Signed by the Governor
2015-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2015-06-01SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-06-01HouseSigned in the House
2015-06-01HouseReported enrolled
2015-06-01HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2015-05-31SenateRecord vote
2015-05-31SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2015-05-31SenateSenate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
2015-05-31SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2015-05-31HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-31HouseRecord vote
2015-05-31HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2015-05-31HouseHouse adopts resolution to go outside bounds
2015-05-30HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2015-05-30SenateConference committee report filed
2015-05-30HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2015-05-30HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2015-05-29SenateSenate appoints conferees
2015-05-29SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2015-05-29SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2015-05-29SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2015-05-29SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2015-05-29HouseHouse appoints conferees
2015-05-29HouseHouse requests conference committee
2015-05-29HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2015-05-28HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2015-05-28HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2015-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2015-05-27SenateRecord vote
2015-05-27SenatePassed
2015-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-27SenateRecord vote
2015-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2015-05-27SenateAmendment withdrawn
2015-05-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenateAmended
2015-05-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenateAmended
2015-05-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenateAmended
2015-05-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenateAmended
2015-05-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenateAmended
2015-05-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenateAmended
2015-05-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenateAmended
2015-05-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenateAmended
2015-05-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenateAmended
2015-05-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenateAmended
2015-05-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenateAmended
2015-05-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-27SenateRead 2nd time
2015-05-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-05-26SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2015-05-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-05-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-05-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-15SenateReferred to Education
2015-05-15SenateRead first time
2015-05-14SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-13HouseRecord vote
2015-05-13HousePassed as amended
2015-05-13HouseAmended
2015-05-13HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-12HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-12HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-05-12HouseAmended
2015-05-12HouseAmended
2015-05-12HouseAmended
2015-05-12HouseAmended
2015-05-12HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-12HouseAmended
2015-05-12HouseAmended
2015-05-12HouseAmended
2015-05-12HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-05-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-28HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-21HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-21HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-11HouseReferred to Public Education
2015-03-11HouseRead first time
2015-02-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback