TX HB1814 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the confidentiality of and discovery procedures relating to certain material regarding the protection or security of a witness; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the confidentiality of and discovery procedures relating to certain material regarding the protection or security of a witness; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-11HouseRead first time
2021-02-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB508 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - Not again placed on intent calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback