TX HB1810 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain exclusions for personal automobile liability insurance.
Title
Relating to certain exclusions for personal automobile liability insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-15 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2013-04-09 | House | No action taken in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2013-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Insurance
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility