TX HB1792 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the evaluation of child-care providers participating in the Texas Rising Star Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the evaluation of child-care providers participating in the Texas Rising Star Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#196 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-05SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-05SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-04-19SenateRead first time
2021-04-14SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-14HouseRecord vote RV#196
2021-04-14HousePassed
2021-04-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-13HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-13HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-10HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2021-03-10HouseRead first time
2021-02-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB694 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1792
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01792I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01792H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01792E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01792S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01792I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01792H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01792H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01792E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01792E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1792&RcdVtNo=196&Ch=H&Dt=04/14/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback