TX HB1788 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain required reports received or prepared by state agencies and other governmental entities.
Title
Relating to certain required reports received or prepared by state agencies and other governmental entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB241 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
AUTISM & PERVASIVE DEVELOPMENTAL DISORDERS, TEXAS COUNCIL ON
CHIROPRACTIC EXAMINERS, TEXAS BOARD OF
COLONIAS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
PUBLIC UTILITY COUNSEL, OFFICE OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY--SAN MARCOS
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
VETERANS' LAND BOARD
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
AUTISM & PERVASIVE DEVELOPMENTAL DISORDERS, TEXAS COUNCIL ON
CHIROPRACTIC EXAMINERS, TEXAS BOARD OF
COLONIAS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
PUBLIC UTILITY COUNSEL, OFFICE OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY--SAN MARCOS
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
VETERANS' LAND BOARD
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1788 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01788I.htm |