TX HB1786 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transfer of driver and traffic safety education from the Texas Education Agency and the Department of Public Safety to the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation; changing the amounts of certain fees.
Title
Relating to the transfer of driver and traffic safety education from the Texas Education Agency and the Department of Public Safety to the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation; changing the amounts of certain fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - HB 1786Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 1786Third Reading House (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 1786Third Reading House (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-27 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-29 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-29 | House | Amended |
2015-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2015-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Driver Education & Training
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Driver Education & Training
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills