TX HB1783 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the age of a child at which a juvenile court may exercise jurisdiction over the child and to the minimum age of criminal responsibility.
Title
Relating to the age of a child at which a juvenile court may exercise jurisdiction over the child and to the minimum age of criminal responsibility.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Art Fierro [D] | Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#432 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#432 |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-26 | House | Amended 1-White |
2021-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2021-03-10 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed |