TX HB1750 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the inspection period for a motor vehicle; increasing certain fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the inspection period for a motor vehicle; increasing certain fees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-03HouseWithdrawn from schedule
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback