TX HB1748 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-09 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-09 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the punishment for defendants who commit certain aggravated sexual assaults.
Title
Relating to the punishment for defendants who commit certain aggravated sexual assaults.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Branch [R] | Rep. Abel Herrero [D] | Rep. Allen Fletcher [R] | Rep. Stefani Carter [R] |
Rep. Sarah Davis [R] | Rep. Tony Dale [R] | Rep. Harvey Hilderbran [R] | Rep. James White [R] |
Rep. William Zedler [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - House - HB 1748Third Reading House (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-07 | House | Passed |
2013-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL ASSAULT