TX HB1742 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the mediation of the settlement of certain health benefit claims involving balance billing by out-of-network laboratories.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the mediation of the settlement of certain health benefit claims involving balance billing by out-of-network laboratories.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1853 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1853
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-21SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-29SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-26HouseRecord vote RV#752
2019-04-26HousePassed
2019-04-26HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-26HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-26HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-26HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-15HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1914 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback