TX HB1729 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale of alcoholic beverages in areas annexed by certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the sale of alcoholic beverages in areas annexed by certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1336 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Read 3rd time RV#83 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Read 3rd time RV#83 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-07 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2021-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1336 |
2021-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-19 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-19 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-19 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-01 | House | Record vote RV#83 |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-03-31 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-03-10 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed |