TX HB1725 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to retired members of the Texas State Guard.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to retired members of the Texas State Guard.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-30SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2019-04-30SenateRead first time
2019-04-29SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-26HouseRecord vote RV#752
2019-04-26HousePassed
2019-04-26HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-26HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-26HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-26HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-15HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-08HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback