TX HB1725 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exception to disclosure under the public information law of certain personal information contained in a citation issued for a violation of a state traffic law or local traffic ordinance.
Title
Relating to the exception to disclosure under the public information law of certain personal information contained in a citation issued for a violation of a state traffic law or local traffic ordinance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2017-03-14 | House | Correction in referral |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation |
2017-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed |