TX HB171 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to consideration of mitigating factors in determining appropriate disciplinary action to be taken against a public school student.
Title
Relating to consideration of mitigating factors in determining appropriate disciplinary action to be taken against a public school student.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-06-01 | Record vote | |
2009-06-01 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-06-01 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-28 | Record vote | |
2009-05-28 | Passed | |
2009-05-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-28 | Record vote | |
2009-05-28 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-28 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-28 | Amended | |
2009-05-28 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-28 | Amended | |
2009-05-28 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-28 | Amended | |
2009-05-28 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-28 | Amended | |
2009-05-28 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-28 | Amended | |
2009-05-28 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-28 | Amended | |
2009-05-28 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-28 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-26 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-18 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-12 | Referred to Administration | |
2009-05-12 | Read first time | |
2009-05-04 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-02 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-01 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Passed | |
2009-05-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-01 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-01 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to Public Education | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time | |
2008-11-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2270 (Same As) 2009-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar