TX HB1704 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - Withdrawn from schedule
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - Withdrawn from schedule
Summary
Relating to the punishment of the offense of cruelty to animals.
Title
Relating to the punishment of the offense of cruelty to animals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-07 | Withdrawn from schedule | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-04 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-03 | Read first time | |
2009-02-24 | Filed |