TX HB17 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-7)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a restriction on the regulation of utility services and infrastructure based on the energy source to be used or delivered.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a restriction on the regulation of utility services and infrastructure based on the energy source to be used or delivered.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#64 (Y: 116 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#56 (Y: 113 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Effective immediately
2021-05-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-06 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-05SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-05HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-04HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-04HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-04SenateRecord vote
2021-05-04SenatePassed
2021-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-04SenateRecord vote
2021-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04SenatePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-04SenateRecord vote
2021-05-04SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-05-04SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Eckhardt
2021-05-04SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-04-08SenateRead first time
2021-03-31SenateReceived from the House
2021-03-31HouseReported engrossed
2021-03-31HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-03-31HouseRecord vote RV#64
2021-03-31HousePassed
2021-03-31HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-03-31HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-03-30HouseRecord vote RV#56
2021-03-30HousePassed to engrossment
2021-03-30HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32
2021-03-30HousePoint of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-03-30HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-C. Turner
2021-03-30HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-30HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-08HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-08HouseRead first time
2021-03-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HB1282 (Same As) 2021-03-04 - Referred to State Affairs
SB1262 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB17
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00017I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00017H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00017E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00017S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00017F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00017H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00017S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00017I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00017H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00017H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00017E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00017E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB17&RcdVtNo=56&Ch=H&Dt=03/30/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB17&RcdVtNo=64&Ch=H&Dt=03/31/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-04-F.PDF#page=16

Bill Comments

feedback