TX HB1282 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a restriction on the regulation of utility services and infrastructure based on the energy source to be used or delivered.
Title
Relating to a restriction on the regulation of utility services and infrastructure based on the energy source to be used or delivered.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB17 (Same As) 2021-05-18 - Effective immediately
SB1262 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee
SB1262 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1282 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01282I.htm |