TX HB17 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-12 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-12 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of districts for the election of members of the Texas House of Representatives.
Title
Relating to the composition of districts for the election of members of the Texas House of Representatives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-06-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-06-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-06-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-06-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-06-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-06-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-06-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-06-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-06-03 | House | Referred to Redistricting, Select |
2013-06-03 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-29 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=831&Bill=HB17 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/831/billtext/html/HB00017I.htm |