TX HB1698 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorizing an optional county fee on vehicle registration in certain counties to be used for transportation projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorizing an optional county fee on vehicle registration in certain counties to be used for transportation projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1587 (Y: 95 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#662 (Y: 94 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Filed without the Governor's signature
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1587
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-24HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-18SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-18SenateReferred to Transportation
2021-05-18SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-05SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#662
2021-05-04HousePassed
2021-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-03HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-03HouseAmended 1-Canales
2021-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-03-09HouseRead first time
2021-02-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB624 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Transportation

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1698
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01698I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01698H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01698E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01698S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01698F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01698H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01698I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01698H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01698H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01698E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01698E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01698S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01698S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01698F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1698&RcdVtNo=662&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=23
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1698&RcdVtNo=1587&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback