TX HB1689 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]


Relating to liability of certain governmental entities in certain workers' compensation actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to liability of certain governmental entities in certain workers' compensation actions.


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1070 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]


2017-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-08HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-19HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2017-03-06HouseRead first time


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments