TX HB1671 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to allowing a governmental body to redact certain personal information under the public information law without the necessity of requesting a decision from the attorney general and the calculation of certain deadlines under the public information law.
Title
Relating to allowing a governmental body to redact certain personal information under the public information law without the necessity of requesting a decision from the attorney general and the calculation of certain deadlines under the public information law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2011-05-11 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2011-05-09 | Postponed | |
2011-05-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-29 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-28 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-12 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-03-03 | Read first time | |
2011-02-23 | Filed |