TX HB1670 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transfer of the regulation of plumbing to the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation, following recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission; requiring an occupational license; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the transfer of the regulation of plumbing to the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation, following recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission; requiring an occupational license; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Lambert [R] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Chris Paddie [R] |
Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB621 (Same As) 2019-05-26 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Subjects
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PLUMBERS & PLUMBING
PLUMBING ADVISORY BOARD, TEXAS
PLUMBING EXAMINERS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PLUMBERS & PLUMBING
PLUMBING ADVISORY BOARD, TEXAS
PLUMBING EXAMINERS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1670 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01670I.htm |