TX HB1667 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to increasing the punishment for the offense of promotion of prostitution.
Title
Relating to increasing the punishment for the offense of promotion of prostitution.
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Cindy Burkett [R] |
Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
PROSTITUTION
Crimes--Against Morals
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
PROSTITUTION