TX HB1632 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Texas music incubator rebate program to provide for rebates of a portion of certain taxes collected from certain music venues and promoters of certain music festivals.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Texas music incubator rebate program to provide for rebates of a portion of certain taxes collected from certain music venues and promoters of certain music festivals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-07 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 609 |
2021-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2021-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB609 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
Arts & Humanities
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
MUSIC, FILM, TELEVISION, & MULTIMEDIA OFFICE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Alcoholic Beverages
Taxation--General
Taxation--Sales
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
MUSIC, FILM, TELEVISION, & MULTIMEDIA OFFICE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Alcoholic Beverages
Taxation--General
Taxation--Sales