TX HB1631 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 76-25)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibiting the use of photographic traffic signal enforcement systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibiting the use of photographic traffic signal enforcement systems.

Sponsors

Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]
Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]
Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. John Cyrier [R]
Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]
Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]
Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]
Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]
Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Tracy King [D]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]
Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]
Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]
Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]Rep. Candy Noble [R]
Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]
Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Four Price [R]
Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]
Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]
Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]
Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]
Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]
Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]Sen. Bob Hall [R]
Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Amended RV#1131 (Y: 109 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1094 (Y: 108 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Amendment adopted as amended RV#1093 (Y: 88 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-02 Effective immediately
2019-06-02 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-21 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-17HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-17HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-17SenateRemarks ordered printed
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenatePassed
2019-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenatePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2019-05-17SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Menéndez
2019-05-17SenateAmendment withdrawn
2019-05-17SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez
2019-05-17SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-14SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1131
2019-05-08HousePassed as amended
2019-05-08HouseAmended 1-Hefner
2019-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1094
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-07HouseAmendment withdrawn 4-Tinderholt
2019-05-07HouseAmendment withdrawn 3-Sherman
2019-05-07HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 3
2019-05-07HouseAmendment(s) offered 3-Sherman
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1093
2019-05-07HouseAmendment adopted as amended 1-Martinez
2019-05-07HouseAmendment amended 2-Cain, Clardy, and Landgraf
2019-05-07HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 3
2019-05-07HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Martinez
2019-05-07HousePoint of order overruled Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1), and Rule 8, Section 3; Article III, Section 35
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB653 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1631
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01631I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01631H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01631E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01631S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01631F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1631&RcdVtNo=1093&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1631&RcdVtNo=1094&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1631&RcdVtNo=1131&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-17-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-17-F.PDF#page=18

Bill Comments

feedback