TX HB1627 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to Low-Income Home Energy Assistance Program payments to assist certain households receiving food stamp benefits.
Title
Relating to Low-Income Home Energy Assistance Program payments to assist certain households receiving food stamp benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-29 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-23 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-03-03 | Read first time | |
2009-02-23 | Filed |
Subjects
FOOD STAMPS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
LOW INCOME HOME ENERGY ASSISTANCE PROGRAM
Utilities
Utilities--General
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
LOW INCOME HOME ENERGY ASSISTANCE PROGRAM
Utilities
Utilities--General