TX HB1603 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the chancery court and the court of chancery appeals to hear certain cases; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to the creation of the chancery court and the court of chancery appeals to hear certain cases; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as amended |
2015-04-16 | House | Amendment(s) considered in committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2015-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Corporations & Associations
Courts
Courts--Appellate
Courts--General
Governor
SUPREME COURT
Business & Commerce--General
Corporations & Associations
Courts
Courts--Appellate
Courts--General
Governor
SUPREME COURT