TX HB16 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of certain retail electric products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of certain retail electric products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1009 (Y: 123 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Read 3rd time RV#63 (Y: 116 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Read 2nd time RV#55 (Y: 111 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-05-26 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-14HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-13HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-13SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-12HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-12HouseRecord vote RV#1009
2021-05-12HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-04-29HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-04-29HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-04-29HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenatePassed
2021-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-04-29SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-04-08SenateRead first time
2021-03-31SenateReceived from the House
2021-03-31HouseReported engrossed
2021-03-31HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-03-31HouseRecord vote RV#63
2021-03-31HousePassed
2021-03-31HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-03-30HouseRecord vote RV#55
2021-03-30HousePassed to engrossment
2021-03-30HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-30HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-08HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-08HouseRead first time
2021-03-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1279 (Similar To) 2021-05-05 - Committee report printed and distributed
SB1279 (Similar To) 2021-05-05 - Committee report printed and distributed

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB16
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00016I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00016H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00016E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00016S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00016F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00016I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00016H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00016H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00016E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00016E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00016S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00016S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00016F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB16&RcdVtNo=55&Ch=H&Dt=03/30/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB16&RcdVtNo=63&Ch=H&Dt=03/31/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-29-F.PDF#page=1
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB16&RcdVtNo=1009&Ch=H&Dt=05/12/2021

Bill Comments

feedback