TX HB1580 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorization by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board for certain public junior colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs.
Title
Relating to authorization by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board for certain public junior colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | No action taken in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-26 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2017-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-25 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Science & Technology
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Science & Technology
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1580 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01580I.htm |