TX HB1562 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the allocation and use of the annual constitutional appropriation to certain agencies and institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the allocation and use of the annual constitutional appropriation to certain agencies and institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-10HouseRecalled from subcommittee
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2019-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in s/c
2019-04-03HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred directly to subcommittee by chair
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Appropriations
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB709 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - House passage as amended reported

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback