TX HB156 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to hearings by the Board of Pardons and Paroles regarding clemency matters.
Title
Relating to hearings by the Board of Pardons and Paroles regarding clemency matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#919 (Y: 89 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#919 |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed |
2023-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Crimes
Crimes--Capital Punishment
PARDONS & PAROLES, BOARD OF
TELECONFERENCING
VIDEOCONFERENCING
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Crimes
Crimes--Capital Punishment
PARDONS & PAROLES, BOARD OF
TELECONFERENCING
VIDEOCONFERENCING