TX HB1551 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the elimination of the licensing and registration requirements for ringside physicians and timekeepers for combative sports events.
Title
Relating to the elimination of the licensing and registration requirements for ringside physicians and timekeepers for combative sports events.
Sponsors
Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-04-30 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-15 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PHYSICIANS
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PHYSICIANS