TX HB1532 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the expiration of certain parts of the Texas Economic Development Act.
Title
Relating to the expiration of certain parts of the Texas Economic Development Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-25 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-04-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2011-03-02 | Read first time | |
2011-02-18 | Filed |
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB1532 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB01532I.htm |