TX HB1529 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to procedures in certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship filed by the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Title
Relating to procedures in certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship filed by the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1524 (Y: 97 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - Amended RV#1473 (Y: 91 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - Amended RV#1473 (Y: 91 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#1524 |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed |
2023-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1473 |
2023-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-10 | House | Amended 1-Cook |
2023-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2023-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
EVIDENCE
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child