TX HB1510 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the response and resilience of certain electricity service providers to major weather-related events or other natural disasters; granting authority to issue bonds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the response and resilience of certain electricity service providers to major weather-related events or other natural disasters; granting authority to issue bonds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#327 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Effective immediately
2021-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-19HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-19HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenatePassed
2021-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-04SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-04SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-22SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-04-22SenateRereferred to committee
2021-04-21SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-04-21SenateRead first time
2021-04-20SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-20HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-20HouseRecord vote RV#327
2021-04-20HousePassed
2021-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-19HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1782 (Same As) 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee
SB1782 (Same As) 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1510
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01510I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01510H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01510E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01510S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01510F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01510I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01510H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01510H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01510E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01510E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1510&RcdVtNo=327&Ch=H&Dt=04/20/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-19-F1.PDF#page=5

Bill Comments 750

feedback