TX HB1482 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to measures to assist students enrolled at public institutions of higher education who are homeless or who are or were in foster care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to measures to assist students enrolled at public institutions of higher education who are homeless or who are or were in foster care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Higher Education
2021-05-14SenateRead first time
2021-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#951
2021-05-11HousePassed
2021-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-06HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-03HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Higher Education
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback