TX HB145 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public school students evaluated for purposes of accountability ratings in certain school districts.
Title
Relating to public school students evaluated for purposes of accountability ratings in certain school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB145 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00145I.htm |