TX HB1445 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Effective on 1/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the applicability of the sales and use tax to medical or dental billing services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the applicability of the sales and use tax to medical or dental billing services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#94 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30 Effective on 1/1/22
2021-04-30 Signed by the Governor
2021-04-21 Sent to the Governor
2021-04-21SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-04-21HouseSigned in the House
2021-04-20HouseReported enrolled
2021-04-20HouseSenate passage reported
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-08SenateReferred to Finance
2021-04-08SenateRead first time
2021-04-08SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-07HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-07HouseRecord vote RV#94
2021-04-07HousePassed
2021-04-07HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-06HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-06HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB775 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Finance

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1445
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01445I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01445H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01445E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01445S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01445F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01445I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01445H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01445H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01445E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01445E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1445&RcdVtNo=94&Ch=H&Dt=04/07/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=11

Bill Comments

feedback