TX HB1429 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to rights and remedies of certain residential tenants; providing civil penalties.
Title
Relating to rights and remedies of certain residential tenants; providing civil penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-25 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-17 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-05-16 | Read first time | |
2011-05-16 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-13 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Passed | |
2011-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-12 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-12 | Amended | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-01 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-01 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-31 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-07 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-16 | Filed |
Subjects
FORECLOSURES
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens