TX HB1427 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a review of state laws requiring an action or proceeding to be brought in Travis County or a Travis County court.
Title
Relating to a review of state laws requiring an action or proceeding to be brought in Travis County or a Travis County court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics |
2015-03-10 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Appellate
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
STATE AGENCIES' RULES
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
THIRD COURT OF APPEALS
TRAVIS COUNTY
Courts--Appellate
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
STATE AGENCIES' RULES
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
THIRD COURT OF APPEALS
TRAVIS COUNTY
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB1427 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB01427I.htm |