TX HB1427 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of a responsible third party.
Title
Relating to the designation of a responsible third party.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-01 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-01 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-16 | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB1427 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB01427I.htm |