TX HB1424 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to increasing penalties for defendants convicted of the manufacture or delivery of certain controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to increasing penalties for defendants convicted of the manufacture or delivery of certain controlled substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-29 - House - HB 1424Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - HB 1424Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-06-19 Signed by the Governor
2015-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2015-06-01SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-29SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2015-05-29HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2015-05-29HouseRecord vote
2015-05-29HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2015-05-28HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2015-05-28HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2015-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2015-05-27SenateRecord vote
2015-05-27SenatePassed
2015-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-27SenateRecord vote
2015-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-27SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-27SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-25SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-25SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-21SenatePosting rule suspended
2015-05-15SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2015-05-15SenateRead first time
2015-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-12HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-12HouseRecord vote
2015-05-12HousePassed
2015-05-12HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-11HousePassed to engrossment
2015-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-22HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-04-22HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-09HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2015-03-09HouseRead first time
2015-02-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback