TX HB139 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the posting of certain notices for political subdivisions on the comptroller's Internet website.
Title
Relating to the posting of certain notices for political subdivisions on the comptroller's Internet website.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
County Government
County Government--General
INTERNET
Political Subdivisions
PUBLIC NOTICE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
City Government--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
County Government
County Government--General
INTERNET
Political Subdivisions
PUBLIC NOTICE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB139 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00139I.htm |