TX HB1387 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-26 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the number of school marshals that may be appointed to serve on a public school campus or at a private school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the number of school marshals that may be appointed to serve on a public school campus or at a private school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1106 (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1105 (Y: 63 N: 83 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1080 (Y: 82 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - RV#1079 (Y: 85 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateReferred to Education
2019-05-15SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1106
2019-05-08HousePassed
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1105
2019-05-08HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-Hinojosa
2019-05-08HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-Goodwin
2019-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1080
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1079
2019-05-07HouseAmended 1-Hefner
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB244 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Referred to Public Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1387
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01387I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01387H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01387E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01387S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01387F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1387&RcdVtNo=1079&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1387&RcdVtNo=1080&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1387&RcdVtNo=1105&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1387&RcdVtNo=1106&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=139
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=148

Bill Comments

feedback