TX HB1379 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to coercive conditions placed on the receipt by this state of federal money.
Title
Relating to coercive conditions placed on the receipt by this state of federal money.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-06 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-16 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Federalism & Fiscal Responsibility, Select |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Governor
State Finances
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE-FEDERAL RELATIONS, OFFICE OF
Governor
State Finances
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE-FEDERAL RELATIONS, OFFICE OF