TX HB1371 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the continuation of the Trade Agricultural Inspection Grant Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the continuation of the Trade Agricultural Inspection Grant Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1563 (Y: 119 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#369 (Y: 135 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective immediately
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1563
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenatePassed
2021-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-10SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-04SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-03SenateReferred to Transportation
2021-05-03SenateRead first time
2021-04-21SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-21HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21HouseRecord vote RV#369
2021-04-21HousePassed
2021-04-21HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1566 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - Not again placed on intent calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1371
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01371I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01371H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01371S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01371F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01371I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01371H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01371E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01371E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01371S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01371S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01371F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1371&RcdVtNo=369&Ch=H&Dt=04/21/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1371&RcdVtNo=1563&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments

feedback