TX HB1360 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the effect under the public information law of the disclosure of certain information by a prosecutor to defense counsel.
Title
Relating to the effect under the public information law of the disclosure of certain information by a prosecutor to defense counsel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-05-04 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-01 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-01 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Passed | |
2009-05-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-04-29 | Postponed | |
2009-04-29 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-07 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-01 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-01 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-04 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-04 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time | |
2009-02-17 | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Defense Counsel
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
Open Records
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Defense Counsel
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
Open Records