TX HB136 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidentiality and reporting of certain information on maternal mortality to the Department of State Health Services and to a work group establishing a maternal mortality and morbidity data registry.
Title
Relating to the confidentiality and reporting of certain information on maternal mortality to the Department of State Health Services and to a work group establishing a maternal mortality and morbidity data registry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Governor
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
MATERNAL MORTALITY & MORBIDITY TASK FORCE
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
TEXAS MATERNAL MORTALITY AND MORBIDITY REVIEW COMMITTEE
Women
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
MATERNAL MORTALITY & MORBIDITY TASK FORCE
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
TEXAS MATERNAL MORTALITY AND MORBIDITY REVIEW COMMITTEE
Women